FL H0759 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-243

Summary

Revises procedures for election of, & qualification & residency requirements for, members of district's board of supervisors; updates obsolete language; revises application of definition of "electors"; excludes certain lands from those for which landowner is entitled to vote at landowners' meeting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Northern Palm Beach County Improvement District

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-243
2010-05-26 Approved by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01285
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00944; Read 3rd time -SJ 00944; Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00944
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00867; Referred to Rules -SJ 00867
2010-04-23 In Messages
2010-04-23 Read 3rd time -HJ 00933; Passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 -HJ 00933
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00912
2010-03-10 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 00268; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00268
2010-03-08 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/10/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00070; On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 9:30 am, 306-H; Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -HJ 00169; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00169
2010-02-17 Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 9 NAYS 0; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-02-10 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 9:30 am, 306-H
2010-02-05 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-01-19 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback