FL H0757 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts certain employees working in state & employers of such workers from Florida's Workers' Compensation Law under certain conditions; provides requirements for establishment of prima facie evidence that employer carries certain workers' compensation insurance; requires courts to take judicial notice of construction of certain laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Reciprocity in Workers' Compensation Claims

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC)
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Policy Council; General Government Policy Council -HJ 00070
2010-02-05 Referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Policy Council; General Government Policy Council
2010-01-19 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1448 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
044009Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback