FL H0753 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for use of funds provided under TANF State Plan for purchase of disposable diapers by parents receiving financial assistance under certain conditions & consistent with federal law.
Title
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families State Plan
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1434 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/753 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0753/BillText/Filed/PDF |