FL H0751 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-58
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requires sellers that sell, lease, or offer to sell or lease any services to consumers pursuant to certain contracts to disclose automatic renewal provisions; provides disclosure requirements; provides exceptions to disclosure requirements; provides that certain violations will render automatic renewal provision void & unenforceable; provides definitions & applicability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatic Renewal of Service Contracts [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0042 - Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0966 - Passage (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-58
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-26 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01092
2010-04-26 In Messages; Received -SJ 00867; Referred to Commerce; Judiciary -SJ 00867; Withdrawn from Commerce; Judiciary -SJ 00862; Substituted for CS/SB 1332 -SJ 00862; Read 2nd time -SJ 00862; Read 3rd time -SJ 00862; CS passed; YEAS 33 NAYS 1 -SJ 00862
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -HJ 01063; CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 -HJ 01063
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00951
2010-03-26 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00408
2010-03-25 Favorable by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00408
2010-03-23 On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 03/25/10, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2010-03-22 Favorable by Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00379; Now in General Government Policy Council -HJ 00379
2010-03-18 CS read 1st time on 03/18/10 -HJ 00337; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP) -HJ 00340; On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 03/22/10, 3:15 pm, Reed Hall
2010-03-17 CS by Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00342
2010-03-15 On Committee agenda-- Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), 03/17/10, 2:15 pm, Webster Hall
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00069
2010-02-05 Referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); General Government Policy Council
2010-01-19 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1332 (Similar To) 2010-04-26 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00862; Substituted CS/HB 751 -SJ 00862; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 751 (Ch. 2010-58) -SJ 00862

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback