FL H0747 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
Pending: House Professions and Public Health Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 9:00 am House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that health care providers & health care payers have right to not participate in or pay for any health care services that violate their consciences; prohibits person from taking or threatening to take adverse action against such providers & payers for specified actions; provides for civil remedies & damages; provides immunity from civil, criminal, & administrative liability for such providers & payers under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protections of Medical Conscience

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21HouseAdded to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-13HouseNow in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-11-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1820 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38100321Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback