FL H0747 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-57
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revises Diabetes Advisory Council membership; prohibits school districts from restricting assignment of diabetic students to certain schools for certain reasons; authorizes student to manage diabetes while at school, at school-sponsored activities, or in transit to or from school or school-sponsored activities with written authorization from parent & physician; provides for indemnification of specified employees, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Treatment of Diabetes [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0030 - Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - House - House Roll Call No. 0776 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-57
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-26 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01092
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -SJ 00817; CS passed; YEAS 31 NAYS 0 -SJ 00817
2010-04-23 Withdrawn from Education Pre-K - 12; Health Regulation; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 00792; Substituted for CS/CS/SB 896 -SJ 00792; Read 2nd time -SJ 00792
2010-04-21 Received -SJ 00717; Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Health Regulation; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 00717
2010-04-15 In Messages
2010-04-15 Read 3rd time -HJ 00687; CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00687; Immediately certified -HJ 00714
2010-04-13 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00667
2010-04-08 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00646
2010-04-07 CS read 1st time on 04/07/10 -HJ 00627; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20
2010-04-06 CS/CS by- Education Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00629
2010-04-05 On Council agenda-- Education Policy Council, 04/07/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2010-03-29 Original reference(s) removed: Health & Family Services Policy Council; PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED); CS referred to Education Policy Council -HJ 00424; Now in Education Policy Council
2010-03-26 CS read 1st time on 03/26/10 -HJ 00402; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-25 CS by PreK-12 Policy (EPC); YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00408
2010-03-23 PCS on Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Policy (EPC), 03/25/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Health & Family Services Policy Council; PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED); Education Policy Council -HJ 00069
2010-02-05 Referred to PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Health & Family Services Policy Council; PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED); Education Policy Council
2010-01-19 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0896 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00792; Amendment(s) adopted (244252, 193452) -SJ 00792; Substituted CS/CS/HB 747 -SJ 00792; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 747 (Ch. 2010-57) -SJ 00792
H0593 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 747 (Ch. 2010-57), CS/HB 889 (Ch. 2010-34), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161)
S1954 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 747 (Ch. 2010-57), CS/HB 889 (Ch. 2010-34), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0385203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10060627Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0747&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb074700.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb074701c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb074702c2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB07470415100776.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB07470426100030.html

Bill Comments

feedback