FL H0745 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes counties or municipalities to grant ad valorem tax exemption on homestead property of certain parent or parents of unmarried veterans who died from combat-related causes while on active duty as members of U.S. Armed Forces.
Title
Homestead Property Tax Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-08 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-11-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H743 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S1638 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
S1636 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
S1638 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
S1636 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/745 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/745/BillText/Filed/PDF |