FL H0741 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises membership & rulemaking authority of the Board of Professional Geologists; revises geologist-in-training registration requirements; revises documents that require the signature, date, & seal of professional geologists; revises applicant requirements for licensure by endorsement; provides requirements for licensure renewal; prohibits submission of documents for public record by certain persons in order to maintain exemption; exempts certain persons practicing professional geology from specified requirements.
Title
Professional Geology
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Goodson [R] | Rep. Matthew Caldwell [R] | Rep. Chuck Clemons [R] | Rep. Bobby Payne [R] |
Rep. Jake Raburn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-08 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-11-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1868 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
492 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 1051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/741 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/741/BillText/Filed/PDF |