FL H0737 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires moment at beginning of each school day & provides requirements for such moment of silence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Moments of Silence in Public Schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#552 (Y: 96 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied on Calendar
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted for SB 946
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-10SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2020-03-05SenateReceived
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Rules
2020-03-04SenateIn Messages
2020-03-04HousePassed; YEAS 96 NAYS 20
2020-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-03HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-18HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2020-02-10HouseNow in Education Committee
2020-02-10HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2020-02-04HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-02-04HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-16HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-11-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S946 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 737

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100345Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback