FL H0731 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that a home education program is not a school district program and is registered with the district school superintendent only for the purpose of complying with the state's attendance requirements; prohibiting a district school superintendent from requiring certain evidence relating to a child's age from children enrolling in specified schools and programs; requiring the department to provide certain teacher and student ACT and PreACT information for the evaluation of certain services and activities, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#905 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#52 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#666 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02 Chapter No. 2018-134
2018-03-30 Approved by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 101 NAYS 0
2018-03-09HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (815502) 1193
2018-03-09HouseIn returning messages
2018-03-09SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (815502) 938
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 732
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2018-02-28SenateReceived
2018-02-28SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2018-02-28SenateIn Messages
2018-02-21HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2018-02-21HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-20HouseAmendment(s) adopted (454191) 638
2018-02-20HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18
2018-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-08HouseCS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
2018-02-08HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-07HouseCS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-02-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/07/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2018-01-30HouseNow in Education Committee
2018-01-30HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2018-01-12HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-11HouseCS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-10HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-09HouseCS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 01/09/18, 1:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2017-12-08HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2017-11-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S732 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 731
S1270 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H1095 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Committee
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6
H323 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 88

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1002385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100326Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100327Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100735Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/731
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/731/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/731/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/731/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/731/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/731/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/731/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/731/Amendment/275349/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/731/Amendment/090137/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/731/Amendment/490993/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/731/Amendment/454191/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/731/Vote/HouseVote_h00731e1666.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/731/Vote/SenateVote_h00731e1052.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/731/Vote/HouseVote_h00731e1905.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback