FL H0731 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-243
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-243
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates exemption from public records requirements for names of spouses & children of specified active or former sworn or civilian law enforcement personnel; provides for future review & repeal of exemption; creates exemption from public records requirements for names of spouses & children of specified state attorneys & statewide prosecutors; provides for future review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Spouses & Children of Law Enforcement & Agency Personnel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#90 (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#90 (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Chapter No. 2013-243 | |
2013-06-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-26 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-24 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 376 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-12 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 107 NAYS 4 |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (352993) |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/13 |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/13, 8:30 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-27 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/27/13, 10:30 am, Webster Hall |
2013-03-21 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2013-03-20 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-20 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-19 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/19/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0376 (Same As) 2013-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 731 (Ch. 2013-243)