FL H0729 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires counties to develop a specified plan for implementing a text-to-911 system and have a system to receive 911 text messages by a specified date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Text-to-911 Service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-11-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1026 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
365172Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback