FL H0729 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-220
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-220
Summary
Prohibits practice of tattooing except by person licensed or registered by DOH; provides for licensure of tattoo artists & temporary registration of guest tattoo artists licensed in jurisdictions outside of state; requires tattoo artists to complete DOH-approved education course & pass examination; exempts certain personnel who perform tattooing for medical or dental purposes from regulation under specified provisions, etc.
Title
Practice of Tattooing [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Chapter No. 2010-220 | |
2010-06-04 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01694 | |
2010-04-30 | Received -SJ 01585; Referred to Health Regulation; Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Finance and Tax; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 01585; Withdrawn from Health Regulation; Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Finance and Tax; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 01246; Substituted for CS/SB 942 -SJ 01246; Read 2nd time -SJ 01246; Read 3rd time -SJ 01246; CS passed; YEAS 30 NAYS 4 -SJ 01246 | |
2010-04-26 | In Messages | |
2010-04-26 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01086; CS passed; YEAS 108 NAYS 2 -HJ 01086 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01009 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00682 | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable by- Health & Family Services Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00682 | |
2010-04-09 | On Council agenda-- Health & Family Services Policy Council, 04/13/10, 9:15 am, Webster Hall | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00610; Now in Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00610 | |
2010-04-02 | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations (CGHC), 04/06/10, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall | |
2010-03-24 | Now in Health Care Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00395 | |
2010-03-23 | CS read 1st time on 03/23/10 -HJ 00373; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-22 | CS by Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00380 | |
2010-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), 03/22/10, 1:45 pm, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00067 | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council | |
2010-01-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0942 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01246; Substituted CS/HB 729 -SJ 01246; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 729 (Ch. 2010-220) -SJ 01246
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0381 | 00771 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00773 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00775 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00777 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00779 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00781 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00783 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00785 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00787 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00789 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0381 | 00791 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0877 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0729&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |