FL H0723 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies duties & activities of community health workers; creates Community Health Worker Task Force within state college or university; requires DOH to provide administrative support; provides membership & duties of task force; provides that task force members serve without compensation & are not entitled to reimbursement for per diem or travel expenses; requires task force to meet at least quarterly; requires report to Governor & Legislature.
Title
Community Health Workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 70 | |
2011-11-29 | Referred to Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 70 | |
2011-11-18 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/723 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0723/BillText/Filed/HTML |