FL H0721 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires jails to provide medical information pertaining to defendants who have been adjudicated incompetent to proceed or adjudicated not guilty by reason of insanity & committed to DCF; requires continued administration of psychotropic medication to certain defendants when discharged & transferred to jails under certain conditions; specifies final authority regarding administration of such medication; removes requirement that DCF develop certification process by rule for community substance abuse prevention coalitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health & Substance Abuse Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#44 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#552 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in returning Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-09HouseIn returning messages
2018-03-09SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (741006)
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 960
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateReceived
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2018-02-07SenateIn Messages
2018-01-31HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-01-31HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-31HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-25HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18
2018-01-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-22HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2018-01-19HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-18HouseCS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/18/18, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-10HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-09HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/09/18, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2017-12-07HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-12-06HouseFavorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 4:00 pm, 12 HOB
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-11-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S960 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 721

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
397321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
91613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
91615Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback