FL H0717 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendments to State Constitution to authorize surviving spouse of deceased veteran to carry over certain discounts on ad valorem taxes on homestead property under specified circumstances; authorizes transfer of discount to another permanent residence if surviving spouse remains unmarried.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ad Valorem Tax Discount for Spouses of Certain Deceased Veterans Who Had Permanent, Combat-Related Disabilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied on Calendar
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-10HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2019-04-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/10/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-25HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-25HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/25/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-14HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2019-03-13HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-12HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H719 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
S886 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S888 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback