FL H0711 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Office of Alcohol & Drug Control Policy within EOG; provides for appointment of director & duties of office; requires office to adopt rules & submit annual report to Governor & Legislature; requires AHCA, in consultation with DCF, to seek federal approval of waiver to increase federal Medicaid funding for specified purposes relating to substance use disorders.
Title
Alcohol and Substance Abuse Prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S504 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/711 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/711/BillText/Filed/PDF |