FL H0711 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Earn & Learn Grant Program within DOE; specifies purpose of program; provides definitions & department responsibilities; provides requirements for preapprenticeship & apprenticeship programs receiving grant funds; establishes Task Force on Apprenticeship Expansion within DEO; specifies goals of task force; provides for composition & meetings of task force; requires department to provide assistance to task force; requires task force to submit report to Governor & Legislature by specified date; provides for termination of task force; provides appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preapprenticeship and Apprenticeship Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-27HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee
2017-11-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1388 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
446011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446093Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446094Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback