FL H0709 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides each person has certain fundamental rights related to reproductive health care; prohibits person, state, local governmental entity, or any political subdivision of state from discriminating against, denying, unduly burdening, or interfering with exercise of such fundamental rights; provides for civil cause of action & remedies; provides recovery limits of sovereign immunity apply.
Title
Reproductive Health Care Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Diamond [D] | Rep. Kristen Arrington [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Michele Rayner-Goolsby [D] |
Sen. Geraldine Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1036 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/709 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/709/BillText/Filed/PDF |