FL H0707 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits Governor, Lieutenant Governor, or member of Cabinet from soliciting or accepting contributions during regular, extended, or special legislative session; provides that member of Legislature is bound by rules of his or her respective house; provides penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Finance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#741 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Ethics and Elections
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-02SenateReceived
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 2
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-08HouseFavorable by- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 02/08/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-18HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-18HouseNow in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2018-01-17HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-17HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2018-01-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2017-11-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1474 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10608Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback