FL H0705 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption for certain records relating to sale of surplus lands; authorizes disclosure of such records under certain circumstances; provides for future legislative review & repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Water Management District Surplus Lands

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#638 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09 Chapter No. 2018-156
2018-04-06 Approved by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 808
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-28SenateReceived
2018-02-28SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-28SenateIn Messages
2018-02-21HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-02-21HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-20HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-14HouseCS/CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2018-02-14HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-13HouseCS/CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/13/18, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-12HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-11HouseCS/CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-10HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-10HouseCS/CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2018-01-09HouseCS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2017-12-11HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2017-12-08HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-12-06HouseCS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 2:00 pm, 12 HOB
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H703 (Related) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-155
S808 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 705
S806 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 703

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
373089Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback