FL H0699 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on November 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 934
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 934
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates exemption from public records requirements for individual identifying information contained in homelessness counts & databases; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Homelessness Counts and Databases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 934 |
2022-03-04 | House | Substituted SB 934 |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022) |
2022-02-17 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2022-02-11 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-09 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-09 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-18 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | Favorable by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S934 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-33