FL H0695 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 1058
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 1058
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for coverage under Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund of certain policies assumed by authorized insurers or Citizens Property Insurance Corporation.
Title
Property Insurer Reimbursements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 1058 |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted SB 1058 |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-10 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2022-02-01 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2022-01-13 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-11-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1058 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - Chapter No. 2022-132