FL H0695 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Removes authority of DHSMV to conduct pilot program to evaluate designs, concepts, & technologies for alternative license plates; exempts owners of digital license plates from certain penalties; creates Digital License Plate Pilot Program within DHSMV; provides purpose; requires DHSMV to begin administering program on specified date; provides program requirements; authorizes DHSMV to contract with digital license plate providers; provides additional authorizations to DHSMV relating to program; specifies requirements for digital license plates, digital license plate providers, & digital license plate consumers; authorizes DHSMV to adopt rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Digital License Plate Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#160 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateDied in Appropriations
2021-04-20SenateReceived
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-04-15HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-15SenateIn Messages
2021-04-15HouseImmediately certified
2021-04-15HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
2021-04-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-15HouseAmendment 709685 adopted
2021-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-09HouseAmendment 709685 filed
2021-04-08HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021)
2021-03-26HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-03-26HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-03-24House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-03-24HouseCS Filed
2021-03-24HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-24HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-03-24HouseFavorable with CS by Commerce Committee
2021-03-22HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-03-08HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-03-08HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-08HouseOriginal reference removed: Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-04House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-04HouseCS Filed
2021-03-04HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-04HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-03HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-01HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-02-18HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S862 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008069Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/695
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/695/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/695/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/695/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/695/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/695/Amendment/641741/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/695/Amendment/709685/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/695/Analyses/h0695.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/695/Analyses/h0695a.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/695/Analyses/h0695b.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/695/Analyses/h0695c.COM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/695/Vote/HouseVote_h00695c2160.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=57172&IsPCB=0&BillId=71183
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59232&IsPCB=0&BillId=71183

Bill Comments 750

feedback