FL H0695 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Grants certain benefits to firefighter upon receiving diagnosis of cancer if certain conditions are met; requires employer to make certain disability payments to firefighter in the event of total and permanent disability; provides death benefits; specifies costs associated with benefits are to be borne by the employer; requires Division of the State Fire Marshal to adopt rules; provides declaration of important state interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighters

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall -- Workshopped
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S900 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1121816Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback