FL H0689 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises power & authority of division to include appointment of division personnel; authorizes AHCA to certify sanitation of alcoholic beverage license applicant's place of business; revises provisions relating to special licenses to sell alcoholic beverages for licensed caterers; removes fee for transfer or location change of temporary beverage license; authorizes minors employed by specified businesses to sell beer & wine under certain circumstances; revises requirements for annual state license tax for distillery & craft distillery.
Title
Division of Alcoholic Beverages and Tobacco
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Ways and Means Committee | House Careers and Competition Subcommittee | Sen. Colleen Burton [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#224 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#224 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Chapter No. 2017-137 | |
2017-06-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-04-28 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-04-28 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 400 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Appropriations |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time 861 |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | House | CS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17 |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-19 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/19/17, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2017-04-07 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | CS/CS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-05 | House | CS/CS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 04/05/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-24 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-21 | House | CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0400 (Similar To) 2017-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 689 (Ch. 2017-137)
H0141 (Similar To) 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-46
S0166 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 141 (Ch. 2017-46)
S388 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 689 (Ch. 2017-137)
H0141 (Similar To) 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-46
S0166 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 141 (Ch. 2017-46)
S388 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 689 (Ch. 2017-137)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
561 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
562 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
564 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
565 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |