FL H0683 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of confidential registration certificates & license plates or decals under fictitious name to criminal conflict & civil regional counsel offices to conduct specified law enforcement activities; expands public records exemption to include all records pertaining to registration application submitted by regional counsel office; provides for future legislative review & repeal; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Criminal Conflict and Civil Regional Counsel Offices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S762 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules