FL H0679 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain requirements must be met before adoption of regulation of unregulated profession or occupation or substantial expansion of regulation of regulated profession or occupation; requires state agency to provide certain information to Legislature; revises information that legislative committee must consider when determining whether regulation is justified.
Title
Legislative Review of Proposed Regulation of Unregulated Functions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-04-03 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-03-27 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19 |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/14/19, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-06 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-02-27 | House | Now in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2019-02-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-02-21 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-14 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 02/21/19, 10:30 am, Webster Hall |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1672 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology