FL H0677 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-25 - Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
Pending: House Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 27 @ 8:00 am House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes courts to take judicial notice of information taken from widely accepted web mapping services, global satellite imaging sites, or Internet mapping tools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judicial Notice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-25HouseAdded to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-13HouseNow in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-11-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S634 (Similar To) 2022-01-25 - Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
902035Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback