FL H0677 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes chiropractic physicians who have completed specified training to administer articles of natural origin; authorizes licensed pharmacists to fill such chiropractors' orders for articles of natural origin; authorizes specified number of certain chiropractic continuing education hours to be completed online; provides requirements for such online chiropractic continuing education courses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chiropractic Medicine

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Health Quality Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-03HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-11-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S230 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 713
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
S1124 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1138 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
460403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
460408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4604166Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback