FL H0673 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain fiscally constrained counties to use designated percentage of tourist development tax revenues received to reimburse for expenses incurred for certain purposes; provides specifications for use of those tax revenues.
Title
Tourist Development Taxes
Sponsors
House Ways and Means Committee | House Tourism, Infrastructure and Energy Subcommittee | Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] | Rep. Patt Maney [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-18 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-17 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-17 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2022-02-10 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Original reference removed: Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-09 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-09 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | PCS added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1542 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism