FL H0673 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provisions requiring registration of cosmetics with DBPR.
Title
Cosmetic Product Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-03-04 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-03-04 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/04/15, 9:00 am, 306 HOB |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0612 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
499 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/673 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0673/BillText/Filed/PDF |