FL H0673 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1012 (Ch. 2014-91), CS/CS/SB 1278 (Ch. 2014-99)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1012 (Ch. 2014-91), CS/CS/SB 1278 (Ch. 2014-99)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to financial institutions & regulation by OFR; revises definitions & provisions relating to prohibited acts & practices by financial institutions; preempts regulation of certain financial institutions to state; permits local governments, DLA, & law enforcement to engage in certain proceedings; revises provisions relating to administrative fines & procedures; provides procedures to protect trade secrets; provides that provisions controlling money laundering also include terrorist financing; provides that financial institution is not liable in certain actions solely by virtue of extending loan; authorizes credit unions to pay health & accident insurance premiums & to fund employee benefit plans.
Title
Financial Institutions
Sponsors
House Regulatory Affairs Committee | House Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee | Sen. Douglas Broxson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1012 (Ch. 2014-91), CS/CS/SB 1278 (Ch. 2014-99) |
2014-04-28 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 1012 |
2014-04-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14 |
2014-04-25 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2014-04-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14 |
2014-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-15 | House | CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2014-04-15 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-04-10 | House | CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/10/14, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-10 | House | CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-10 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-03-07 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-04 | House | CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/04/14, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2014-02-20 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-02-19 | House | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 02/19/14, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-01-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0675 (Related) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1278 (Ch. 2014-99), CS/CS/SB 1012 (Ch. 2014-91)
S1012 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-91, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1278 (Ch. 2014-99)
S1278 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-99, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1012 (Ch. 2014-91)
S1012 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-91, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1278 (Ch. 2014-99)
S1278 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-99, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1012 (Ch. 2014-91)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
655 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 0322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 0385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 0591 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 921 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 948 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
657 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
657 | 028 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
657 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
663 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
663 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
663 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
663 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
665 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
665 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
665 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
667 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
667 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
667 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |