FL H0671 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Directs DHSMV to develop Highwaymen license plate; establishes annual use fee for plate; provides for distribution & use of fees collected from sale of plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Government Accountability Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-24HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-24HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2018-01-16HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-11HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-11HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-09HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/09/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1414 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H1359 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H1287 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback