FL H0669 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1140
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1140
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes individuals with fire alarm certifications to complete reduced number of training & continuing education hours for prevention of false alarms; requires training & continuing education courses be approved by Electrical Contractors' Licensing Board; provides permitting process requirements for local enforcement agency & contractor for fire alarm system projects; requires local enforcement agency to issue certain permits in person or electronically; requires local enforcement agency to perform at least one inspection for fire alarm system project; requires contractor to keep certain documentation at worksite.
Title
Alarm Systems
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | Rep. Randy Maggard [R] | Rep. Michelle Salzman [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1140 |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 1140 |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-01-26 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-01-26 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-01-25 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-25 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2022-01-14 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Original reference removed: State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-13 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-13 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1140 (Same As) 2022-05-19 - Chapter No. 2022-124
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
489 | 5185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 793 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 7932 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |