FL H0663 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires notary public to record specified information in notarial journal when performing certain notarial acts & retain journal for specified period; requires notary public to notify EOG if notarial journal becomes inaccessible during retention period; requires law firm employees who perform notarial services for firm to maintain separate notarial journal for certain notarial acts pertaining to law firm & its clients; requires law firm to comply with notarial journal maintenance & security requirements; provides that failure to comply with notarial journal requirements does not invalidate lawful notarization; provides that failure to comply with notarial journal requirements constitutes grounds for suspension, nonrenewal, or denial of notary public commission; provides applicability; exempts certain acts of specified law enforcement & correctional officers from notarial journal requirements.
Title
Notaries Public
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0436 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
117 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/663 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0663/BillText/Filed/PDF |