FL H0661 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes certain persons & entities to correct certain documents; provides that correction filed for certain reasons are not subject to department fee; requires department to send notice of filing of record through e-mail or send copy of document to mailing address of entity, representative, or agent; provides notice requirements for department if record changes entity's e-mail or mailing address.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Filings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#816 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22 Chapter No. 2018-58
2018-03-21 Approved by Governor
2018-03-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-06HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-06SenateCS passed; YEAS 29 NAYS 2
2018-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 610
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-03-05SenateReceived
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations 726
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time 837
2018-03-02HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-22HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-02-13HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-02-13HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/18, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2018-01-16HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-12HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-12HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-10HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S610 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 661

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6050103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6170123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6170124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6170125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201812Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6202108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6208105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62081054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6208303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6208304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6208704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6208914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6208918Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6209001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6209102Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback