FL H0661 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Commissioner of Insurance Regulation to permit temporary exception to specified minimum surplus requirements under specified circumstances; revises authority of OIR to take action against noncomplying insurers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surplus Requirements/Mortgage Guaranty Insurers [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0011 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Roll Call No. 0843 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-56
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-23 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01032
2010-04-22 Read 3rd time -SJ 00725; Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 -SJ 00725
2010-04-21 In Messages; Received -SJ 00717; Referred to Banking and Insurance; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00717; Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00672; Substituted for SB 2084 -SJ 00672; Read 2nd time -SJ 00672
2010-04-21 Read 3rd time -HJ 00802; Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00802
2010-04-20 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00781
2010-04-12 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00663
2010-04-09 Favorable by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00663
2010-04-07 On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 04/09/10, 11:45 am, Morris Hall
2010-03-18 Favorable by Policy Council; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 00342; Now in General Government Policy Council -HJ 00342
2010-03-16 On Council agenda-- Policy Council, 03/18/10, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2010-03-11 Favorable by Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00269; Now in Policy Council -HJ 00269
2010-03-09 On Committee agenda-- Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), 03/11/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Policy Council; General Government Policy Council -HJ 00060
2010-01-28 Referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Policy Council; General Government Policy Council
2010-01-14 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2084 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00672; Substituted HB 661 -SJ 00672; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 661 (Ch. 2010-56) -SJ 00672

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0635042Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback