FL H0655 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises private school eligibility requirements for participation in certain educational scholarship programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private School Eligibility Requirements for Participation in Educational Scholarship Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-18HouseNow in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
2021-02-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S600 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1002421Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback