FL H0653 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes AHCA to pay for donor human milk bank services as optional Medicaid service under certain conditions; specifies eligibility criteria; adds such services to list of Medicaid services authorized for reimbursement on fee-for-service basis & list of services covered by managed care plans.
Title
Donor Human Milk Bank Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S756 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/653 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/653/BillText/Filed/PDF |