FL H0653 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding an exemption from public records requirements for a photograph or video or audio recording held by an agency that depicts or records the killing of a law enforcement officer to include a photograph or video or audio recording held by an agency that depicts or records the killing of a victim of a school shooting or the killing of a victim of a mass shooting; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Photographs or Video or Audio Recordings that Depict or Record Killing of a Victim of a School Shooting or Victim of a Mass Shooting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#754 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Messages
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HousePassed as amended; YEAS 107 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseAmendment(s) adopted (413703) 782
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-22HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2018-02-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-29HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-29HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2018-01-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/29/18, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2018-01-23HouseNow in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2018-01-23HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1178 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
406136Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback