FL H0651 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "survivors" to include parents of unborn child; provides definition for term "unborn child"; prohibits right of action against mother for wrongful death of unborn child; authorizes parents of unborn child to recover certain damages.
Title
Civil Liability for the Wrongful Death of an Unborn Child
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Jenna Persons-Mulicka [R] | Rep. Mike Beltran [R] |
Rep. Berny Jacques [R] | Rep. Rachel Plakon [R] | Rep. Will Robinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-21 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-21 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2024-01-22 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-18 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-18 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-18 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-18 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-18 | House | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-16 | House | PCS added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-07 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-12-07 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-11-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S476 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
768 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |