FL H0647 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits commercial use or distribution of law enforcement photographs, images, or video recordings of deceased person or that show person's extreme, severe, or acute injuries, which are confidential & exempt from public records laws; provides that such photographs, images, & video recordings remain confidential & exempt from public records laws when used or transmitted under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Use of Law Enforcement Photographs, Images, Etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00059 | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-01-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1496 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
H0649 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
S1506 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
H0649 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
S1506 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice