FL H0643 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides conditions under which certain motor vehicle repair shops are exempt from providing specified information to customers.
Title
Motor Vehicle Repair Shops
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-11-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1088 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
559 | 903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/643 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/643/BillText/Filed/PDF |