FL H0637 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides small businesses are not required to collect sales & use tax on retail sale of certain items of tangible personal property during specified timeframe.
Title
Small Business Saturday Sales Tax Holiday
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S302 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/637 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/637/BillText/Filed/PDF |