FL H0635 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from public records requirements for certain identifying & location information of current & former judicial assistants & their spouses & children; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Judicial Assistants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-08HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2019-03-06HouseFavorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-02-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S746 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback