FL H0633 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires employees of certain businesses to complete specified courses on the detection of human trafficking; requires specified number of hours in school bus training program be allocated to human trafficking prevention.
Title
Human Trafficking Prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Commerce Committee |
2019-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1368 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
488 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/633 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/633/BillText/Filed/PDF |