FL H0631 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-52
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises types of airports eligible for specified funding of master planning & eligible aviation development projects by DOT.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Airport Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#610 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-08 Chapter No. 2022-52
2022-04-06 Approved by Governor
2022-03-28 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2022-03-02HouseOrdered enrolled
2022-03-02HouseIn Messages
2022-03-02SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2022-03-02SenateRead 3rd time
2022-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2022-03-02SenateSubstituted for SB 780
2022-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2022-03-02SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2022-02-28SenateReceived
2022-02-25SenateReferred to Appropriations
2022-02-25SenateIn Messages
2022-02-25HouseImmediately certified
2022-02-25HousePassed; YEAS 107, NAYS 0
2022-02-25HouseRead 3rd time
2022-02-24HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2022-02-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2022-02-24HouseRead 2nd time
2022-02-17HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (2/24/2022)
2022-02-10HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2022-02-10HouseBill released to House Calendar
2022-02-10HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2022-02-10HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2022-02-08HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2022-02-03HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2022-02-03HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-02-03HouseFavorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-02-01HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-06HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-12-06HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-12-06HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-11-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S780 (Same As) 2022-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 631

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
332007Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/631
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/631/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/631/BillText/er/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/631/Analyses/h0631.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/631/Analyses/h0631a.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/631/Analyses/h0631b.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/631/Analyses/h0631c.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/631/Analyses/h0631d.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/631/Analyses/h0631z.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/631/Analyses/h0631z1.TIE.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=64368&IsPCB=0&BillId=74538
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=64861&IsPCB=0&BillId=74538
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/631/Vote/HouseVote_h00631__610.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/631/Vote/SenateVote_h00631__023.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback