FL H0631 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-94
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes person with superior right to possession of real property to recover possession by ejectment; provides that person entitled to possession of real property has cause of action to regain possession from another person who obtained possession of real property by forcible entry, unlawful entry, or unlawful detainer; prohibits local government from enacting or enforcing ordinance or rule based on customary use; provides an exception; creates, revises, & repeals related procedural provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Possession of Real Property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#885 (Y: 95 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#625 (Y: 92 N: 14 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27 Chapter No. 2018-94
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-08HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 95 NAYS 17 1110
2018-03-08HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (296326) 1109
2018-03-06HouseIn returning messages
2018-03-06SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 29 NAYS 7 770
2018-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-05SenateAmendment(s) adopted (296326)
2018-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-05SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 804
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-05SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
2018-02-21SenateReceived
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
2018-02-20SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 92 NAYS 14
2018-02-14HouseAmendment(s) adopted (645239)
2018-02-14HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-01-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-25HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 3
2018-01-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/25/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-16HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-01-11HouseCS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time 308
2018-01-11HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-10HouseCS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-11-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S804 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 631

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
163035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
66021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82101Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/631
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/631/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/631/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/631/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/631/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/631/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/631/Amendment/219199/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/631/Amendment/699959/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/631/Amendment/645239/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/631/Vote/HouseVote_h00631c1625.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/631/Vote/SenateVote_h00631e1012.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/631/Vote/HouseVote_h00631e1885.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback