FL H0629 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of the Lottery to include a specified warning in advertisements or promotions of lottery games; providing requirements for such warning; requiring contracts between the department and a vendor to include a provision that requires the vendor to place or print a specified warning on all lottery tickets, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lottery Games

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#365 (Y: 98 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#151 (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28 Vetoed by Governor
2019-06-25 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-03HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 98 NAYS 8
2019-05-03HouseConcurred in 2 amendment(s) (549588, 834516)
2019-05-02HouseIn returning messages
2019-05-02SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 13
2019-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-01SenateAmendment(s) adopted (549588, 834516)
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/19
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-24SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
2019-04-23SenateFavorable with 1 amendment(s) by- Rules (834516); YEAS 11 NAYS 6
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseImmediately certified
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 2
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-04HouseFavorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 1
2019-04-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-26HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-05HouseCS by Gaming Control Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-25HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-02-20HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-20HouseCS by Gaming Control Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 1
2019-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Gaming Control Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Gaming Control Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1264 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
241056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24111Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/629
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/629/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/629/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/629/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/629/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/629/Amendment/648635/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/629/Amendment/834516/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/629/Amendment/549588/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/629/Vote/HouseVote_h00629c1151.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/629/Vote/SenateVote_h00629c1015.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/629/Vote/HouseVote_h00629c1365.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback